Ecological Rights Foundation v. Pacificorp et al
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Defendant: PacifiCorp and Pacific Power
Case Number: 4:2023cv05179
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Orion (Orion, Brian) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar DENYING #17 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Stipulation. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation filed by Ecological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension to Oppose Motion to Dismiss)(Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties against PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. Filed by Ecological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 11/29/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 22 Renotice motion hearing re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation filed byPacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (Related document(s) #18 , #17 ) (Thorme, Melissa) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 24, 2024 by Noon for the Motion hearing and February 16, 2023 by Noon for the CMC..General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 18 Declaration of Melissa Thorme ISO Motion to Dismiss Complaint, Part 2 of 2, and Proposed Order Granting Motion and Dismissing Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation)(Thorme, Melissa) (Filed on 11/17/2023) Modified on 11/20/2023 (ls, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Ecological Rights Foundation filed by PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 1/12/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Responses due by 12/1/2023. Replies due by 12/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Declaration of Melissa A. Thorme In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Part 1 of 2)(Thorme, Melissa) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Steven G. Jones. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steven Jones ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18847609.) filed by PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Anne Thorme for Defendants PacifiCorp, et al. (Thorme, Melissa) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
October 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ecological Rights Foundation. Pacific Power served on 10/20/23, answer due 11/10/23. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 10/24/2023) Modified on 10/24/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXCUTED by Ecological Rights Foundation. PacifiCorp served on 10/13/23, answer due 11/3/23. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 10/24/2023) Modified on 10/24/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Ecological Rights Foundation, #13 Certificate of Service filed by Ecological Rights Foundation. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to PacifiCorp, Pacific Power. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ecological Rights Foundation.. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Nicholas Wilcox (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2024 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ecological Rights Foundation (Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2023)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pacific Power, Pacificorp ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18724623.). Filed byEcological Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sproul, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecological Rights Foundation v. Pacificorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecological Rights Foundation
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Represented By: Stuart Nicholas Wilcox
Represented By: Brian Orion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Melissa Anne Thorme
Represented By: Steven G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Power
Represented By: Melissa Anne Thorme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?