Rossi et al v. PostMeds, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Rossi, Michael Thomas and Marissa Porter
Defendant: PostMeds, Inc. doing business as TRUEPILL
Case Number: 4:2023cv05732
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for February 6, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by January 30th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. The February 6, 2024 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2023) Modified on 12/26/2023 to remove All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-05726-HSG since I spread and that case no. appears on all the cases (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/8/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 12/5/2023. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2023)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT POSTMEDS, INC. DBA TRUEPILL'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE. Defendant shall have until 30 days after Plaintiffs' filing of a consolidated complaint to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 30, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT POSTMEDS, INC. DBA TRUEPILL'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE filed by PostMeds, Inc., John Rossi, Michael Thomas, and Marissa Porter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCutcheon, Marcus) (Filed on 11/29/2023) Modified on 11/30/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2023. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2024. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/13/2023. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 11/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Rossi, Marissa Porter, Michael Thomas. PostMeds, Inc. served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (McLean, Kyle) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marissa Porter, John Rossi, Michael Thomas.. (McLean, Kyle) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings by Marissa Porter, John Rossi, Michael Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McLean, Kyle) (Filed on 11/8/2023) Modified on 11/9/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PostMeds, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/21/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McLean, Kyle) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Class Action Complaint) against PostMeds, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18814786.). Filed by John Rossi, Marissa Porter, Michael Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLean, Kyle) (Filed on 11/7/2023) Modified on 11/7/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossi et al v. PostMeds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rossi
Represented By: Kyle Douglas McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas
Represented By: Kyle Douglas McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Porter
Represented By: Kyle Douglas McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PostMeds, Inc. doing business as TRUEPILL
Represented By: Marcus Shane McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?