M.J.R. v. USA et al
Plaintiff: M.J.R.
Defendant: USA and Andrew Jones
Case Number: 4:2023cv05821
Filed: November 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/18/2023. Total Time in Court: 51 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher; via Zoom. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2023)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Tse for Discovery Purposes. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Further Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 15, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Set Deadlines as to #11 in 4:23-cv-04155-YGR: MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. Parties' Proposed Order on Psychological Evaluations due by 12/15/2023. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion in 23-4155 due by 12/28/2023. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/3/2024 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification due by 1/5/2023. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/12/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 11, 2023 Filing 20 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2023. Total Time in Court: 1:31. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina, via Zoom. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2023)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2023. Total Time in Court: 1:31. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina, via Zoom. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2023)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Hoar on behalf of United States of America (Hoar, Erin) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Rose Vogel on behalf of United States of America (Vogel, Kristen) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.J.R.. Andrew Jones served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (Burns, Todd) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 12/11/2023 at 1:00 PM is continued to 12/11/2023 at 3:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 12/4/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2023 at 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. All cases set specially on the December 11, 2023, 1:00 pm case management calendar for cases arising out of alleged conduct in the Dublin Correctional Facility SHALL MEET AND CONFER and SHALL file ONE JOINT case management statement to identify areas of overlap versus areas of distinction. The statement shall include a spreadsheet with all cases, counsel and basic information to assist the Court with case management. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 8, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 11/17/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. 22-cv-05137-YGR is related to 23-cv-05821-VKD. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/17/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/14/2023. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.J.R.. USA served on 11/14/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Jones. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2023)
November 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lodging of Administrative Motion Re Related Case Filed in MR v. FCI Dublin, et al, Case No. 22-cv-5137-YGR by M.J.R. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/11/2023) Modified on 11/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/11/2023)
November 11, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/11/2023)
November 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Anonymously filed by M.J.R.. Responses due by 11/27/2023. Replies due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/11/2023)
November 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18827534). Filed by M.J.R. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Todd) (Filed on 11/11/2023) Modified on 11/13/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.J.R. v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.J.R.
Represented By: Todd William Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kristen Rose Vogel
Represented By: Erin K. Hoar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?