California Faculty Association et al v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina and G. Chris Brown
Defendant: Mildred Garcia, Cathy Sandeen and Sylvia Alva
Case Number: 4:2023cv06230
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. Chris Brown, California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina re #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #7 Summons Issued, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, on Sylvia Alva, in her official capacity as President of California State University, Fullerton (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. Chris Brown, California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina re #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #7 Summons Issued, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, on Cathy Sandeen, in her official capacity as President of California State University, East (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by G. Chris Brown, California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina re #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #7 Summons Issued, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, on Mildred Garcia, in her official capacity as Chancellor of the California State University (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 1/3/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sylvia Alva, Mildred Garcia, Cathy Sandeen.. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
January 2, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Unterreiner on behalf of Defendants Mildred Garcia, Cathy Sandeen, and Sylvia Alva (Unterreiner, Miles) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G. Chris Brown, California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina.. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/27/2023)
December 26, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 22, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Sylvia Alva, Mildred Garcia, Cathy Sandeen. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 12/22/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sylvia Alva, Mildred Garcia, Cathy Sandeen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2023)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Selma Weinstein (Weinstein, Hannah) (Filed on 12/7/2023)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by G. Chris Brown, California Faculty Association, Jennifer Eagan, Kevin Pina re #1 Complaint, (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18896995.). Filed by California Faculty Association, G. Chris Brown, Kevin Pina, Jennifer Eagan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mass, Julia) (Filed on 12/1/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Faculty Association et al v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Faculty Association
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Hannah Selma Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Eagan
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Hannah Selma Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pina
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Hannah Selma Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Chris Brown
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Hannah Selma Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Garcia
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Miles Unterreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Sandeen
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Miles Unterreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Alva
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Miles Unterreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?