Stanford Health Care v. Humana Health Plan of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care
Defendant: Humana Health Plan of California, Inc. and Humana Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv06611
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Stipulation to Amend the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2). Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2024)
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2) filed by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. (McLean, Everett) (Filed on 1/22/2024)
January 8, 2024 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 4, 2024 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2024)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/5/2024. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company.. (McLean, Everett) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
December 29, 2023 Filing 8 Dkt. #7 Is Approved. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on December 29, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint in 28 Days filed by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Everett J. McLean (McLean, Everett) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company . (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2024. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 26, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) [err101]. The correct cover sheet can be found at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Insurance Company (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/22/2023)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 23CV425333. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-18968621). Filed by Humana Insurance Company, Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Brandi Harris in Support)(Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Health Care v. Humana Health Plan of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care
Represented By: Sean Christopher Rotstan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Represented By: Everett J. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Represented By: Everett J. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?