N. et al v. Coopersurgical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M. N. and O. P.
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc. and The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00696
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 3, 2024 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 4, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287282.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/03/2024 filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING CASES TO 24-cv-00643-JST. Motions terminated: (29 in 4:24-cv-00643-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by E. F., G. H. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MOLLY JEAN GIVEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287282.) filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT THE COOPER COMPANIES' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT re #26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/28/2024. Response due by 5/21/2024. Reply due by 5/28/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT COOPERSURGICAL, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #25 Stipulation. Answer due by 5/21/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #24 Brief JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT THE COOPER COMPANIES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by M. N., O. P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF TRACEY B. COWAN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT THE COOPER COMPNAIES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED ORDER] JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT THE COOPER COMPANIES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT COOPERSURGICAL, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by M. N., O. P.. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 24 Brief re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byThe Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/26/2024 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. Responses due by 4/5/2024. Replies due by 4/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/2024. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2024 11:00 AM - Videoconference Only. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2024) Modified on 3/14/2024 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coopersurgical, Inc... (Perl, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coopersurgical, Inc. (Perl, David) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 8, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Joint) filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/8/2024)
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Alyssa Covington (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/8/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Gallic Perkins (Perkins, Roger) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Taylor (Taylor, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 1, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Evans (Evans, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/1/2024)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc. and The Cooper Companies, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/14/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Perl (Perl, David) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. N., O. P.. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. N., O. P.. Coopersurgical, Inc. served on 2/9/2024, answer due 3/1/2024. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by M. N., O. P... (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/20/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by M. N., O. P. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by M. N., O. P. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2024)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19097044.). Filed by M. N., O. P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 2/6/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. et al v. Coopersurgical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. N.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. P.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: David M. Perl
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: David M. Perl
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Evans
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?