Walden et al v. The Cooper Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kearsten Walden and Zachary Walden
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00903
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Molly Given.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2024)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #26 Stipulation. Responses due by 5/15/2024. Replies due by 5/22/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2024)
April 8, 2024 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Extend Deadlines filed by Kearsten Walden, Zachary Walden. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2024)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 3, 2024 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 4, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287367.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/03/2024 filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RELATING CASES TO 24-cv-00643-JST. Motions terminated: (29 in 4:24-cv-00643-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by E. F., G. H. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287367.) filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19286317.) filed by Kearsten Walden, Zachary Walden. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lazarz, Hannah) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CooperSurgical, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/6/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
April 1, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/6/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/15/2024. Replies due by 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenny A. Covington, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jenny A. Covington, #3 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 4/1/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Alyssa Covington (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Gallic Perkins Notice of Appearance and Request for Service (Perkins, Roger) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Taylor Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Service (Taylor, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Taylor Notice of Appearance and Request for Service (Taylor, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 3/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2024)
March 18, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CooperSurgical, Inc... (Perl, David) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by CooperSurgical, Inc. (Perl, David) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kearsten Walden, Zachary Walden.. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/16/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/29/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/15/2024)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19128397.). Filed by Kearsten Walden, Zachary Walden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/15/2024) Modified on 2/15/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden et al v. The Cooper Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kearsten Walden
Represented By: Tiseme Gabriella Zegeye
Represented By: Sarah Robin London
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Walden
Represented By: Tiseme Gabriella Zegeye
Represented By: Sarah Robin London
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: David M. Perl
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Evans
Represented By: Jennifer Tolkan Persky
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: David M. Perl
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Evans
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?