A.B. et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A.B. and C.D.
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2024cv01061
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 34 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for C.D. (Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 19, 2024 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for A.B. (Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 4/19/2024)
April 15, 2024 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The local counsel listed on your application is not attorney of record for this case. Please have the attorney file a notice of appearance then re-file your application or re-file your application with local counsel that is the attorney of record for this case. Re: #28 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #24 ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287316.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/03/2024 filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Motions terminated: #31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by C.D., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., A.B. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2024)
April 11, 2024 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., A.B. and C.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jenny A. Covington, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jenny A. Covington)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 4/11/2024) Modified on 4/11/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #25 Stipulation.Responses due by 5/9/2024. Replies due by 5/16/2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 3, 2024 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 4, 2024 Filing 28 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #24 ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287316.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/03/2024 filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASES TO 24-cv-00643-JST. Motions terminated: (29 in 4:24-cv-00643-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by E. F., G. H. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by A.B., C.D., CooperSurgical, Inc. and The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 4/3/2024) Modified on 4/4/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 ***DISREGARD ERROR IN FILING PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #28 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19287316.) filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Given Nietfeld, Molly) (Filed on 4/3/2024) Modified on 4/4/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2024 Filing 23 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/1/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/17/2024. Replies due by 4/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CooperSurgical, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/1/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/17/2024. Replies due by 4/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 21 Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing date on a Thursday afternoon at 2:00 PM. The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The earliest motion hearing date is in August 2024. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 3/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CooperSurgical, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2024. Replies due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2024. Replies due by 4/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 26, 2024 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc... (Covington, Jenny) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY (re #6 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms ) filed byA.B., C.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 3/15/2024)
March 12, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Gallic Perkins Request for Service (Perkins, Roger) (Filed on 3/12/2024) Modified on 3/13/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Taylor and Request for Service (Taylor, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/12/2024) Modified on 3/13/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Perl (Perl, David) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 12, 2024 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Re: #9 Notice of Appearance filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 Partial Non-OPPOSITION (re #6 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms ) filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Evans, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/11/2024) Modified on 3/12/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Evans, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Evans and Clark Hill LLP (Evans, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/11/2024)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A.B., C.D... (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/28/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs filed a Motion For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and a hearing has been set for 4/11/2024 01:00 PM. The magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by A.B., C.D.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 3/11/2024. Replies due by 3/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/26/2024)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 23, 2024 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Joseph G. Sauder. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: #1 Complaint filed by C.D., A.B.). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
February 22, 2024 #Electronic filing error. Per local rules, a motion and proposed order to proceed under a pseudonym is required. Additionally, the summons will not be issued until the motion to file under a pseudonym is ruled upon. Re: #1 Complaint filed by C.D., A.B. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2024) Modified on 2/23/2024 (jml, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/7/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by A.B., C.D. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/21/2024)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CooperSurgical, Inc., Does 1-10, The Cooper Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19146734.). Filed by A.B., C.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/21/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.B. et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Nina Gliozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.D.
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Adam E. Polk
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Nina Gliozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Represented By: David M. Perl
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Evans
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Evans
Represented By: Roger Gallic Perkins
Represented By: Jenny Alyssa Covington
Represented By: Molly J. Given Nietfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?