Parada v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Plaintiff: Marco Anthonio Parada
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv01163
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for May 28, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 21st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-01163-HSG. The May 28, 2024 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 3/6/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
March 5, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.. (Gallagher, Mehgan) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 3/4/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG, a publicly held German Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz North America Corporation, Corporate Parent Mercedes-Benz Group for Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 2/26/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV061404. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19161453). Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Lease, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tahsildoost, Soheyl) (Filed on 2/26/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parada v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Anthonio Parada
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Kevin Y. Jacobson
Represented By: Luis A Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Represented By: Mehgan Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?