H.G. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: H.G.
Defendant: United States of America, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ray J. Garcia, Enrique Chavez, Andrew Jones and Cedric Kinlaw
Case Number: 4:2024cv01376
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.G.. Ray J. Garcia served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (Proof of Service Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proc. 4(e) for Defendant Ray J. Garcia) (Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 26, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.G.. Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024; United States of America served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Proof of Service Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proc. 4(i) for Defendants United States of America & Federal Bureau of Prisons) (Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 4/26/2024)
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Enrique Chavez, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Ray J. Garcia, Andrew Jones, Cedric Kinlaw, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19269596.) filed by H.G.. (Nimni, Oren) (Filed on 3/28/2024)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19266378.) filed by H.G.. (Montes, Amaris) (Filed on 3/27/2024)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19251813.) filed by H.G.. (Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Filed on 3/22/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D'Amore Bradley for Plaintiff (D'Amore Bradley, Brooke) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Raftrey for Plaintiff (Raftrey, Mark) (Filed on 3/20/2024)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 3/19/2024. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2024)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. 22-cv-05137-YGR is related to 24-cv-01376-LB. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/18/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by H.G. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carson Anderson, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 3/7/2024) Modified on 3/8/2024 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Relate Case (Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 & Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11) filed by H.G.. (Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by H.G. (Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2024)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19196813.). Filed by H.G.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Carson) (Filed on 3/7/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.G. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.G.
Represented By: Carson Dean Anderson
Represented By: Amaris Montes
Represented By: Brooke D'Amore Bradley
Represented By: Mark Raftrey
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Represented By: Stephen Seungkun Cha-Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray J. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Kinlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?