Cumberland County Board of Education v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cumberland County Board of Education
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc.,, Facebook Payments, Inc., Siculus Inc., Facebook Operations LLC, Instagram LLC, Facebook Holdings LLC, Meta Payments Inc, Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok Ltd, TikTok LLC, Bytedance Ltd, ByteDance Inc., Google LLC and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv02448
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:24-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cumberland County Board of Education (Black, Janet Ward)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok, Ltd., YouTube, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 7, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Cumberland County Board of Education. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cumberland County Board of Education. Corrected summonses for Facebook Holdings, LLC. and Meta Payments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Corrected) (Black, Janet Ward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily J. Beeson on behalf of Cumberland County Board of Education. (Beeson, Emily)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of Cumberland County Board of Education. (Black, Janet Ward)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7507952.), filed by Cumberland County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Meta Platforms Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Facebook Payments, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Siculus, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Facebook Operations, #6 Proposed Summons Instagram, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons Snap, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons TikTok Inc., #9 Proposed Summons TikTok, Ltd., #10 Proposed Summons TikTok LLC, #11 Proposed Summons Bytedance Ltd., #12 Proposed Summons Bytedance Inc., #13 Proposed Summons Google LLC, #14 Proposed Summons Youtube LLC, #15 Proposed Summons Facebook Holdings, LLC., #16 Proposed Summons Meta Payments, Inc.) (Black, Janet Ward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cumberland County Board of Education v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cumberland County Board of Education
Represented By: Emily J. Beeson
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Payments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bytedance Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?