Mitcham v. Calderon, et al
Petitioner: Stephen Louis Mitcham
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford, Jill Brown, Robert L. Ayers, Robert K Wong, Vince Cullen and Michael Martel
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 5:1997cv03825
Filed: August 10, 1994
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: DPLC VG
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/1/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS TO CLAIM DS SUBCLAIM OF INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/1/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/30/2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER re 403 Response filed by Kevin Chappell Replies due by 11/25/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/19/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 401 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 395 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 393 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 391 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 387 Motion for Extension of Time to File (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitcham v. Calderon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Louis Mitcham
Represented By: Neoma Kenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Brown
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K Wong
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vince Cullen
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martel
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?