USA, et al v. Alisal Water Corp, et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Alisal Water Corp, Toro Water Service, Inc., Robert T. Adcock, Patricia Adcock, North Monterey County Water Service, Inc., Mosslanding Water Servise, Inc., Natholyn P. Adcock, Bruce Pierson and David M. Simcho
Receiver: John W. Richardson
Miscellaneous: Pajaro Sunny Mesa Community Services District
Case Number: 5:1997cv20099
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER GRANTING 1000 MOTION FOR ORDER CORRECTING CLERICAL MISTAKES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/25/2019. THE JUNE 27, 2019 HEARING DATE IS VACATED. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER DISCHARGING RECEIVER AND TERMINATING PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/12/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER APPROVING 990 STIPULATION TO APPROVAL OF RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT AND REQUEST FOR COMPENSATION; DISCHARGE OF RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/1/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER EXTENDING RECEIVERSHIP THROUGH MAY 31, 2011 WITH RESPECT TO ALCO AND SAN JERARDO; AND THEREAFTER EXTENDING RECEIVERSHIP THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2011 WITH RESPECT TO SAN JERARDO ONLY (terminating 949 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER EXTENDING RECEIVERSHIP FOR ONE MONTH; AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE COUNTY'S REQUEST TO EXTEND RECEIVERSHIP THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/30/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 948 AMENDED ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER AND COUNTY TO EXECUTE PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT (granting 944 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/7/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO EXECUTE PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT (granting 936 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER EXTENDING RECEIVERSHIP FOR LIMITED PURPOSE (granting 939 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/1/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNTY AND RECEIVER TO EXECUTE AMENDMENT NO. 2 TO INTERIM FILTRATION AGREEMENT (granting 928 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER (1) EXTENDING RECEIVERSHIP FOR LIMITED PURPOSE; AND (2) ADDRESSING 906 , 909 , 910 MATTERS HEARD ON OCTOBER 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 886 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Opposition due 5/25/2009, reply due 6/1/2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/11/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 6/3/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 881 EX PARTE APPLICATION. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL (1) GRANTING 826 THE RECEIVER'S APPLICATION FOR AUTHORITY TO RETAIN CERTAIN FUNDS TO PAY MONTHLY OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, INSURANCE, AND WELL REMOVAL COSTS FOR THE SAN JERARDO WATER SYSTEM; (2)DIRECTING P AYMENT OF THE RECEIVER'S EXPENSES AND COSTS ITEMIZED IN THE RECEIVER'S STATUS REPORTS FOR THE PERIODS 11/1/07 - 4/30/08 AND 11/1/06 - 10/31/07; AND (3) DENYING AS MOOT 879 THE RECEIVER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ADDITIONAL $5,000 TO PAY OPERATING AND MAINTENANCE EXPENSES FOR THE SAN JERARDO WATER SYSTEM. (This order disposes of document nos. 826 , 842 and 879 ). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO RETAIN AN ADDITIONAL $5,000 FROM THE SALE PROCEEDS TO PAY OPERATING AND MAINTENANCE EXPENSES OF THE SAN JERARDO WATER SYSTEM (granting document no. 871 ). (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA, et al v. Alisal Water Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Kevin T. Haroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisal Water Corp
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro Water Service, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Adcock
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Adcock
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Monterey County Water Service, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosslanding Water Servise, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natholyn P. Adcock
Represented By: Marc Peter Fairman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pierson
Represented By: Kevin T. Haroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Simcho
Represented By: Joe Alfred Izen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: John W. Richardson
Represented By: Diana Donabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Pajaro Sunny Mesa Community Services District
Represented By: Paul Daniel Gullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?