Redd, et al v. Daley, et al

Plaintiff: Paul A. Redd, Jr.
Defendant: MIchael D. Daley
Case Number: 5:1998cv20429
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2015 249 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 248 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CASE filed by MIchael D. Daley. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
March 2, 2015 247 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 246 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MIchael D. Daley. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
January 13, 2015 240 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 239 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by MIchael D. Daley Discovery due by 3/2/2015. Status Report due by 1/29/2015. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 2/5/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
November 26, 2014 237 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 236 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Discovery Cutoff Dates filed by Paul A. Redd, Jr. Discovery due by 2/2/2015.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
September 12, 2014 231 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/12/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
August 26, 2014 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 8/26/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 15, 2014 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 226 STIPULATION To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Paul A. Redd, Jr.. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2014. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco, Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
April 29, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 218 Clerks Notice, Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Paul A. Redd, Jr. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
September 10, 2009 192 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 25, 2008 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING 149 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (2) VACATING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; AND (3) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS 148 , 152 , 153 , 154 , 155 , 162 , 165 , 168 , 169 , 171 , 172 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/25/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redd, et al v. Daley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIchael D. Daley
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Redd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?