Dennis v. Ayers

Petitioner: William Michael Dennis
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: State Bar of CA, California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 5:1998cv21027
Filed: October 9, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO BE PRESENT AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
February 24, 2014 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 334 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING PETITIONER FROM ASSERTING PRIVILEGE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/24/2014. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 11, 2014 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 320 PETITIONER'S CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE; 321 PETITIONER'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PRIVILEGED MATERIAL UNDER SEAL; AND 326 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S REPLY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT A RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S REPLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/11/2014. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 3, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER ISSUED DECEMBER 21, 2012. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/3/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 21, 2012 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 286 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST TO CERTIFY INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/21/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
September 25, 2012 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 263 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/25/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
March 21, 2012 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION (granting 275 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/21/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 10, 2012 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS REGARDING SCHEDULING (addressing 264 , 266 , 270 , 271 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/10/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
May 2, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING PENDING MOTIONS ( 257 , 258 , 260 , 261 ); SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/2/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
June 24, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BIFURCATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/24/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
December 29, 2008 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 214 RESPONDENT'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/29/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Michael Dennis
Represented By: Peter Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: State Bar of CA
Represented By: Marie Mae Moffat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?