Myron, et al v. Terhune, et al

Case Number: 5:1999cv21265
Filed: December 29, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANAMENDED COMPLAINT; REQUESTING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE TO PROVIDE COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF re 253 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint . For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that an indefinite continuance is not appropriate, but will grant Plaintiff an extension time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than fifty-six (56) days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/26/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
February 12, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(m) re 187 MOTION for Reconsideration, 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by James Myron. Defendants John H. Burk; Rita Clayton; Davis; Davis; E. Donnelly; Alfonso K. Fill ion; Hill; Kilpatrick; Kuenzi; M. S. Madison; C. Moreno; Parkinson; R. Peralez; C. Pickering; Puig; Rings; S. Shipman; Smith; Tann; J. Thompson; B. White; Wittenberg; V. Barron and J. Basso terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
November 12, 2008 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS; The CLERK SHALL REISSUE SUMMONS as to defendants Alfonso K. Fillion, P. Hamilton, R. Peralez, B. White, John H. Burke, C. Pickering, Rit a Clayton, J. Thompson, C. Moreno, V. Barron, E. Donnelly, and M.S. Madison Plaintiff MUST provide the Court with the address of defendants Shipman, Mandeville and Basso within 20 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff MUST pro vide the first name or initial and addresses of defendants Duck, Smith, Tann, Rings, Hill, Davis, Kilpatrick, Puig, Dr. Davis, Dr. Kuenzi, Dr. Parkinson, and Dr. Wittenberg within 20 days from the date of this order; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FIL E OPPOSITION re 149 Motion for Order of restraint and disclosure, 150 MOTION Disclosure, Subpoenas and Service of Defendants, 164 MOTION for an order MOTION for Sanctions, 162 MOTION for Return of Property MOTION for Sanctions, 147 MOTION o rder to limit defense, 172 MOTION to Compel, 181 MOTION to Compel, 152 MOTION for court documents in order to amend complaint, 159 MOTION to Enforce Judgment, 175 MOTION to Compel, 149 MOTION for Disclosure, 183 MOTION for court action, 170 MOTION for relief from court orders.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified text on 11/12/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myron, et al v. Terhune, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?