Shields v. Lamarque

Case Number: 5:2000cv20868
Filed: August 15, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; DENYING Certificate of Appealability (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
July 27, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING COPIES OF BRIEFS AND EXHIBITS RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 27, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
January 15, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DEEMING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS SUBMITTED. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 15, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Lamarque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?