Elena Del Campo v. American Corrective Counseling

Plaintiff: Elena M. Del Campo and Lois Artz
Defendant: American Corrective Counseling Services Inc, Don R Mealing, Bruce D. Raye, ACCS Administration, Inc., R.D Davis, Green, Kramer and Lopez
Consol_plaintiff: MIRIAM CAMPOS, Lisa Johnston and Ashorina Medina
Consol_defendant: Fulfillment Unlimited, Inc.,, Fundamental Performance Strategies, Lynn R. Hasney and Inc. Fundamentals
Intervenor: Maria Hamilton, Damon Wright, Audra Phillips and Lydia Rosario
3rd_party_defendant: Damon Wright
Miscellaneous: National Corrective Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2001cv21151
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 1384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting stipulation for dismissal.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/12/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
April 1, 2014 1375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/1/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
February 18, 2014 1362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 1360 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 1360 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 2/18/2014. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
January 16, 2014 1349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISSCOVERY DISPUTE re 1340 , 1344 . NCG to produce all/any other documents requested within two weeks of the entry of this Order. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/17/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2014 1347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Dr. Baker to show cause, in a document to be filed with the Court on or before January 31, 2014, why she should not be removed as a class representative in this litigation. The Court will then rule on class counsels motion to withdraw as counsel for Dr. Baker.(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2013 1339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 1338 Motion to Appear by Telephone (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
September 18, 2013 1328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 1327 Letter filed by Lynn R. Hasney, Don R Mealing Settlement Conference set for 12/4/2013 09:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 5, 2013 1322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO (1) FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, (2) REVISE CLASS DEFINITION, AND (3) APPOINT ADDITIONAL CLASS COUNSEL AND REPRESENTATIVE 1312 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
January 16, 2013 1289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW 1285 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
November 21, 2012 1284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco., Motions terminated: 1282 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion For Administrative Relief to Lift Stay and to Set a Case Management Conference CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1281 filed by Elena M. Del Campo.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/21/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
December 13, 2011 1259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/13/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 5, 2011 1255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 8, 2011 1249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating pretrial conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 8, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
July 15, 2011 1194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 6, 2011 1193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Discovery due by 12/12/2011. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 11/11/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
May 24, 2011 1180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 1166 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 1152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 1114 Motion to Quash (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 17, 2011 1148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE re 1146 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Lynn R. Hasney, Inc. Fundamentals, Don R Mealing. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 17, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
December 13, 2010 1108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING POST-TRIAL CONFERENCE. On or before 1/14/2011, the parties shall file a Joint Post-Trial Conference Statement, which shall include, among other things, a statement regarding any remaining issues requiring resolution, such as equitabl e relief and attorney fees motions. To the extent there are anticipated post-trial motions, the parties shall also propose a briefing schedule and a hearing date consistent with the Court's calendar for those motions. Post-Trial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 24, 2010 1076 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining in part re 1049 Objection, filed by Ashorina Medina, Lisa Johnston, Elena M. Del Campo (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 12, 2010 1043 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFUNCT AND UNSERVED PARTIES re 1041 Stipulation. Fulfillment Unlimited, Inc., Fundamental Performance Strategies, Green, Kramer, Lopez, ACCS Administration, Inc. and R.D Davis terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 9, 2010 1038 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES; AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 959 Motion to Compel; denying 961 Motion for Sanctions; granting 973 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 3, 2010 1034 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLASS MAILING LIST AND CONTACTING CLASS MEMBERS re 1028 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 22, 2010 1017 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR A SEALING ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5(d) re 1014 Proposed Order filed by The Caprock Group Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 22, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 7, 2010 966 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 924 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
September 20, 2010 934 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR DISCOVERY RESPONSES; AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY CAPROCK GROUP, INC. by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part 904 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 911 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 933 Motion to Appear by Telephone (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 25, 2010 922 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 915 Motion to Shorten Time (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 11, 2010 909 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DEFENDANT DON MEALING TO SUPPLEMENT DISCOVERY RESPONSES re 908 Stipulation filed by Ashorina Medina, Lisa Johnston, Elena M. Del CampoSigned by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on August 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
March 16, 2010 869 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MARCH 5, 2010 ORDER; ORDER SETTING FURTHER BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 856 Motion to Amend/Correct; (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 8, 2010 846 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS IN [UN]RELATED CASE TO INTERVENE AND TO MODIFY THE JANUARY 3, 2007 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 786 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Modify filed by Lois Artz, Ashorina Medina, Lisa Johnston, Elena M. Del Campo. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 5, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 9, 2010 819 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SECOND AMENDED JOINT SUBMISSION OF CLASS NOTICE PLAN re 777 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Ashorina Medina, Lisa Johnston, Elena M. Del Campo. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 9, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
November 12, 2009 775 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 774 Joint Case Management Statement. The parties shall appear for a hearing on their anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment on Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties sh all notice their motions in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of this Court. Pursuant to the parties' request, the Court modifies the page limit for the opening brief to thirty pages. The page limits for the Opposition and Reply briefs shall remain unchanged, pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-3. The parties shall jointly file a proposed class notice on or before 12/7/2009. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 23, 2009 773 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying 756 Motion for Protective Order; granting 758 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 761 Motion to Continue. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
May 20, 2009 762 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request of Withdrawal of Jenkins Goodman Neuman & Hamilton LLP as Counsel of Record For Bankrupt Defendant filed by American Corrective Counseling Services Inc re 755 Declaration. Motions terminated: 752 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney And Request For An Order Permitting Withdrawal of Jenkins Goodman Neuman & Hamilton LLP as Counsel of Record For Bankrupt Defendant filed by American Corrective Counseling Services Inc. Attorney Charles Edward Perkins; Charles D. Jenkins and Dan Day Kim terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
March 12, 2009 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 734 Motion to Stay (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 20, 2009 733 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying re 722 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Summary Judgment & Injunction Motion & Memo filed by Lois Artz, Ashorina Medina, Lisa Johnston, Elena M. Del Campo. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 20, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 10, 2009 731 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Case Management Conference. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2009 at 9:00 AM. Please see Order regarding expedited briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 23, 2009 725 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXTENDED BRIEF AS MOOT 722 (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 30, 2008 715 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 710 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Timothy P. Irving terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/30/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 700 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Statement of Clarification re: Class Definition. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 29, 2008. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 682 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Implied Motion to Bifurcate Class Certification; Directing Plaintiffs to File Supplemental Motion for Class Certification Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(3) (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 8, 2008 672 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CHALLENGE THE DESIGNATION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting [597 ]Motion for Discovery, re 599 , 608 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified docket text to create linkage on 3/31/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elena Del Campo v. American Corrective Counseling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena M. Del Campo
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Artz
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Corrective Counseling Services Inc
Represented By: Peter Manfred Bransten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don R Mealing
Represented By: David L. Hartsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Raye
Represented By: David L. Hartsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCS Administration, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh Tabor Verano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: MIRIAM CAMPOS
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Lisa Johnston
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Ashorina Medina
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Fulfillment Unlimited, Inc.,
Represented By: Eric Neil Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Fundamental Performance Strategies
Represented By: Eric Neil Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Lynn R. Hasney
Represented By: Eric Neil Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Inc. Fundamentals
Represented By: Eric Neil Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Maria Hamilton
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Damon Wright
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Audra Phillips
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lydia Rosario
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Damon Wright
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: National Corrective Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua G Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?