Craver v. Roe

Case Number: 5:2002cv04629
Filed: September 25, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/24/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
October 6, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REOPEN ACTION; LIFING STAY AND REOPENING ACTION re 24 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
May 21, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 22 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/18/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craver v. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?