Lara v. Posner et al

Plaintiff: Jose Luis Lara
Defendant: Posner, Willis and Haffner
Case Number: 5:2002cv05429
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AGAINST UNSERVED DEFENDANT POSNER UNDER RULE 4(m); CLOSING CASE. Accordingly, the action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to unserved defendant Dr. Posner pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. As there are no remaining Defendants in this matter, this action is DISMISSED. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 20, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Reissue Summons to Defendant Posner; Directing Plaintiff to Provide Court with Location Information for Defendant Posner. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 4, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE TO FILE NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OFSUMMONS ON DEFENDANT POSNER. The Court hereby orders the Attorney General to file notice regarding the current employment status of Dr. Posner at CSP and the status of t he summons issued on March 31, 2010, at his last known place of employment. The Attorney General is directed to file a response no later than fourteen (14) days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
September 22, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AGAINST UNSERVED DEFENDANT HAFFNER UNDER RULE 4(m); DIRECTING CORCORAN STATE PRISON OFFICIALS TO FILE NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT POSNER. Accordingly, the action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to unserve d defendant Dr. Haffner pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk shall terminate defendant Haffner from this action. The Litigation Coordinator at Corcoran State Prison (CSP) is hereby ordered to file notice within thi rty (30) days from the date this order is filed, stating the status of Defendant Dr. Posner's current employment status at CSP and whether defendant received notice of and/or received the summons issued on 3/31/2010. The clerk shall send a courtesy copy of this order to the Attorney General's office. ***Defendant Haffner terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
March 26, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REISSUE SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANT DR. POSNER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
December 18, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REISSUE SUMMONS TO DEFENDANT HAFFNER. The clerk shall re-issue a summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without repayment of fees, a copy of the amended complaint in this matter (Docket No. 12), all attachments th ereto, a copy of the Courts order filed November 9, 2006, (Docket No. 17), and a copy of this order to defendant Haffner at the addresses provided by plaintiff. (Docket No. 65.). Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
October 19, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE PROOF OF SERVICE OR PROVIDE COURT WITH LOCATION INFORMATION FOR DEFENDANT HAFFNER. plaintiff must either himself provide proof of service on defendant Haffner, or provide the Court with his accurate current locati on such that the Marshal is able to effect service. If plaintiff fails to effectuate service on defendant Haffner, or provide the Court with an accurate current location for him, within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed, plaintiffs claims against defendant Haffner will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
February 4, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REISSUE SUMMONS. The clerk shall reissue a summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the amended complaint in this matter (Docket No. 12 ), all attachments thereto , a copy of the Courts order filed November 9, 2006, (Docket No. 17 ), and a copy of this order to defendant Dr. David Posner at Corcoran State Prison, to defendant Dr. Haffner at Salinas Valley State Prison, and to defendant Willis at the address provided by the Litigation Coordinator. (Docket No. 36 .) The Litigation Coordinator is directed to forward the appropriate forms to the appropriate defendants, along with a form for requesting representation by the California At torney Generals Office. The clerk shall also serve a copy of this order to Deputy Attorney General Troy Bentley Overton and Supervising Deputy Attorney General Paul Hammerness.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/31/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Reissue Summons as to defendant Dr. David Posner and Dr. Haffner and U.S. Marshal to serve the Amended Complaint. The clerk shall a courtesy copy of the amended complaint, order of 11/9/06 and this order to the California Attorney General's Office and the SCSP litigant coordinator. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/6/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/8/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Posner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Posner
Represented By: Troy Bentley Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis
Represented By: Troy Bentley Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haffner
Represented By: Troy Bentley Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?