Calloway v. Pelican Bay State Prison Warden et al

Petitioner: James W. Calloway
Respondent: Ronald M. White
Case Number: 5:2002cv05882
Filed: December 18, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Whyte on 2/5/13. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 28, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to submit proposed orders and judgments Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/28/13. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
August 20, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 08/20/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway v. Pelican Bay State Prison Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James W. Calloway
Represented By: Steven Samuel Lubliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald M. White
Represented By: Robert R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?