Croxon v. Enterprise America, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv01144
Filed: March 17, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Johnnie Rogers Only re 56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
June 11, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Show Cause Response or Stipulated Dismissal due by 8/17/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 13, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 44 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment; Setting Case Management Conference (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
December 18, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 31 Motion to Vacate. Deadline to complete jurisdictional discovery set for 3/2/2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008) Modified docket text on 12/19/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croxon v. Enterprise America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?