County of Santa Cruz, California et al v. Ashcroft et al

Plaintiff: James Daniel Baehr, Wo/Men's Alliance for Medical Marijuana, City of Santa Cruz, California, Michael Cheslosky, Levi Castro, Dorothy Gibbs, Eladio V. Acosta, Valerie Corral, County of Santa Cruz, California, Harold F. Margolin and Jennifer Lee Hentz
Defendant: Karen P. Tandy, Michelle Leonhart, William B Simpkins, Thirty Unknown Drug Enforcement Administration Agents, R. Gil Kerlikowske, Edward H. Jurith, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Patrick M. Ward, Mark Filip and John P. Walters
Miscellaneous: Carl Olsen
Case Number: 5:2003cv01802
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 225 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 223 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
December 3, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 219 CONSENT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2009 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 17, 2009 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 217 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 is CONTINUED to 12/4/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 28, 2009 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 214 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONVERT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
May 5, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 207 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference set for 5/7/2009 is CONTINUED to 6/12/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/5/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
September 24, 2008 189 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 188 Extending Time to File Defendants' Answer. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Santa Cruz, California et al v. Ashcroft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Baehr
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wo/Men's Alliance for Medical Marijuana
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Santa Cruz, California
Represented By: John G. Barisone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cheslosky
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Castro
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Gibbs
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eladio V. Acosta
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Corral
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Cruz, California
Represented By: Frank Burke Kennamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold F. Margolin
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lee Hentz
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen P. Tandy
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Leonhart
Represented By: Joel McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B Simpkins
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirty Unknown Drug Enforcement Administration Agents
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gil Kerlikowske
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward H. Jurith
Represented By: Joel McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Joel McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Ward
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Filip
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Walters
Represented By: Mark T. Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Carl Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?