Litmon v. Santa Clara County et al

Plaintiff: David Litmon, Jr., Anthony Norris and Phil Williams
Defendant: Mitchell Conner, K. South, Conner, Alexander Chyorny, Christine Ferry, Michael Meade, Douglas Taylor and Edward Flores
Case Number: 5:2003cv02054
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 104 For Dismissal. The Plaintiff's Appeal is Dismissed. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
May 7, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Appeal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 31, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
October 28, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 15, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Summons and Marshal to Serve Defendant South. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 11, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 61 Motion for Sanctions; Addressing Unserved Defendant. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
February 6, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litmon v. Santa Clara County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Litmon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Conner
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. South
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conner
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Chyorny
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Ferry
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meade
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Taylor
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Flores
Represented By: Marcy Berkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?