Ngo v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv02210
Filed: May 13, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 48 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 27, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANGEMENT ORDER (approving 46 ). The Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2009 is CONTINUED to 9/25/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/27/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
July 16, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (approving 44 ). The Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2009 is CONTINUED to 8/28/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/16/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 18, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CONTINUING CMC (approving 42 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 is CONTINUED to 7/24/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/18/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
April 16, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Case Management Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
December 11, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (approving doc. no. 36 ). The Case Management Conference set for 12/19/08 is CONTINUED to 2/20/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/11/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 15, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CONTINUING CMC (approving docket no. 34 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/14/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 16, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE at Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/16/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ngo v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?