Beltran et al v. County of Santa Clara et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv03767
Filed: August 13, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 200 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
March 26, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 184 to Continue Trial and All Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/26/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 24, 2009 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANT MELISSA SUAREZ FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 180 Letter filed by Emily Tjhin, Melissa Suarez. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 12, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 160 Re: Scheduling of Trial and Trial Related Dates: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion to Bifurcate Trial set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 30, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 132 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 29, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 3/16/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 22, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 152 Ex Parte Application. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
November 21, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 130 to Extend the Deadlines for Expert Disclosure and the Expert Discovery Cutoff, Motions terminated: 126 Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosure and Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Emily Tjhin, Melissa Suarez. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/20/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
September 4, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/4/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?