July 15, 2011 |
Filing
335
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
334
***PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY*** ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING Motions due by 7/11/2011, Oppositions due by 7/25/11 and replies due by 8/1/11. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
330
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 328 Stipulation, filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, III, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
|
April 21, 2011 |
Filing
327
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Re Filing of Motion of Preliminary Settlement Approval and Setting Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settelment re 326 Stipulation. Due to the Court's impending relocation of chambers from San Jose to San Francisco, the Court cannot accommodate the parties' request for a May 2, 2011 hearing date. Instead, the Court sets June 20, 2011 at 9 a.m. as the new hearing date for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. On or before May 6, 2011, the parties shall file their Joint Motion along with all the necessary papers for the Court's evaluation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
325
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Terminating Motions re Trial and Dispositive and Expert Motions Hearing and Setting Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Settlement re 324 Stipulation. The Court sets April 25, 2011 at 9 a.m. for a Hear ing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Becausethe Court must maintain its docket, all pending Motions are deemed as "withdrawn" and shall be terminated by the Clerk of Court. The parties may renotice their Motions should the set tlement not be finalized. Motions terminated: 286 MOTION Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Defendants' Proposed Expert, Kim Nicholl, and Strike Ms. Nicholl's Supplemental Report filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, I II, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison, Edward L. Frazee, 283 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Susan Allison in Support Thereof filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc, [28 0] MOTION Notice and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Ian H. Altman; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc, 288 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A. Paulsen, Lloyd Michael O'Connell, III, Robert Newell, Robert M. Bowden, Chester Madison, Edward L. Frazee. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
313
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT for Brief Continuance of Trial Commencement Date re 312 Stipulation. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 6/7/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2011 01:00 PM - 6/10/2011 01:00 PM; 6/14/2011 01:00 PM - 6/17/2011 01:00 PM; 6/21/2011 01:00 PM - for 6/24/2011 01:00 PM; 6/28/2011 01:00 PM - 7/1/2011 01:00 PM; Jury Deliberations set for 7/5/2011 - 7/8/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing
279
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Dipsositive and Expert Motions Hearing re 278 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 278 Stipulation : Opening briefs due 2/7/2011. Opposition briefs due by 2/18/2011. Reply Briefs due by 3/7/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
272
INTERIM ORDER re 254 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel or, In the Alternative, for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/16/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
271
ORDER GRANTING 270 Amended Joint Proposal for Dissemination of Class Notice. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing
267
ORDER ADOPTING JOINT PROPOSAL FOR DISSEMINATION OF CLASS NOTICE AS MODIFIED 265 Proposed Order. On or before November 12, 2010, the parties shall file an Amended Joint Proposal for Dissemination of Class Notice consistent with this Order for the Court's approval. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing
263
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Class Counsel re 262 Stipulation. The Motion for Clarification 261 is found as MOOT. Motions terminated: 261 MOTION Clarification of Order of October 7, 2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
244
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 Deposition Schedule. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
223
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION re 220 Stipulation filed by Towers Perrin Forster & Crosby Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 26, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
222
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE re 221 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/20/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. No further extensions will be permitted. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
219
ORDER re 218 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
217
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Expert Disclosure Deadlines re 216 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing
215
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING CLASS BRIEFING AND SCHEDULING DEALDLINES re 213 Stipulation. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/20/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Close of All Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 9/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2010. Please see the Court's order for further modifications. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/30/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
212
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 211 Stipulation. The deadline to complete mediation is set for the presumptive 90 day deadline. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing
197
ORDER VACATING 10/19/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'SANTICIPATED MOTION TO DISMISS re 196 Joint Case Management Statement. On or before 11/2/2009, Defendant shall make its Initial Disclosures. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing
193
ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 9/4/2009, Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiffs any agreement, or the fact that there is no such agreement, regarding services provided by Defendant for the CFC Pension Plan. supplemental c omplaint due by 9/18/2009. Answer due 10/26/2009, Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/31/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 2/1/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing
179
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTHCIRCUIT MANDATE re 177 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 8/21/2009. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing
173
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 172 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/22/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
|