Avery v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv04233
Filed: September 16, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 125 for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/20/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
November 21, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 122 to Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/21/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
August 16, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case Settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/16/13. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Attorney Lori Rifkin for Kyle Whelan Avery Added. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/16/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
January 22, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Plaintiff to Federal Pro Bono Project and Staying Proceedings Pending Appointment of Counsel. Motions terminated : 101 MOTION Notice of and Motion to all Parties and the Court for an Order to C.S.P. SAC Litigation Department fo r Transportation to Hearing filed by Kyle Whelan Avery, 104 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kyle Whelan Avery, 102 MOTION to Vacate filed by Kyle Whelan Avery. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
September 12, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for appearance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/12/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
June 24, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 65 ; 72 ; 75 ; 79 ; 82 ; 83 ; 93 Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. The Case is REFERRED to Judge Vadas for Settlement to Take Place Within 120 Days. Case is STAYED Pending the Settlement Conference. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
January 28, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
October 5, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting in Part and Denying in Part 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 30, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 43 Motion for Subpoenas; Granting 57 Motion to Stay; Granting Request for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
July 17, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 47 Second Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 34 Denying Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 12, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 32 Motion to Remove Stay; Order of Partial Dismissal; Order of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?