Syverson et al v. International Business Machines Corporation

Case Number: 5:2003cv04529
Filed: October 7, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 291 of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 24, 2008 253 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 180 Re: Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Rolf Marsh. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
November 5, 2008 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 150 Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Report. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 3, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Report and Setting Deadline for Defendant to File Unredacted Copy of Moving Brief. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/3/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syverson et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?