Stoner v. Santa Clara County Office of Education et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv04622
Filed: October 14, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER NOTING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 80 Request filed by John David Stoner. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
July 14, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by John David Stone. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
March 25, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for Settlement. The parties shall contact Judge Lloyds Chambers within ten (10) days from the date of this Order to arrange their conference. Joint C ase Management Conference statement due 4/17/2009. The statement shall discuss, among other things, a proposed schedule for proceeding with this litigation. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2009 09:00 AM, Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2009 10:00 AM. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
February 4, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 33 USCA Judgment, 38 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 2/27/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoner v. Santa Clara County Office of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?