Williams v. Horsley et al

Plaintiff: Christian R. Williams
Defendant: Don Horsley, County of San Mateo and San Mateo County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2003cv05158
Filed: November 21, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 89 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
October 17, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 86 Re: Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/17/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
July 11, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 84 Re: Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/11/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
April 18, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 81 Re: Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
January 22, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Pro Bono Counsel. Attorney Maria Eurides Dryden for Plaintiff Christian R. Williams added. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
September 24, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-OPENING CASE; Appointing Counsel. Case stayed until four weeks from the date an attorney is appointed to represent plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 29, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Horsley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Horsley
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: David Abraham Silberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?