Evans v. Department of Corrections

Case Number: 5:2003cv05420
Filed: December 3, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 186 Motion for Relief from Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 14, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request for additional time to file notice of appeal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/14/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
January 5, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT signed by Judge Whyte on 1/5/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
October 5, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 164 Motion Relief From Judgment Under Rule 60. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
April 28, 2009 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 151 Motion for Relief From Judgment Under Rule 60. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
October 23, 2008 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
September 11, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/8/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?