Bronner v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Case Number: 5:2003cv05742
Filed: December 19, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 156 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/27/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
March 9, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/9/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 5, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 24, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 129 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/24/2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 30, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Compel (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 18, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DEFERRING DETERMINATION OF 85 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING 90 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 1, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
May 23, 2007 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, ORDER RE STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/23/2007. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronner v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?