Perfect 10, Inc. v. Visa International Service Association et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Perfect 10, Inc.
Defendant: Humboldt Bank, First Data Corporation, Cardservice International, Inc., Visa International Service Association and Mastercard International Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2004cv00371
Filed: January 28, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2005 77 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 12, 2005. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2005)
March 16, 2005 76
Request for Judicial Notice in Further Support of Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Attorney Fees filed byPerfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 3/16/2005)
March 8, 2005 75 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 8, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005)
March 4, 2005 74
Reply Memorandum of P&A ISO Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed byMastercard International Incorporated, Humboldt Bank, Visa International Service Association, First Data Corporation, Cardservice International, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2005)
January 14, 2005 69 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Continuing Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 14, 2005. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2005)
January 10, 2005 68
Memorandum in Opposition [Combined] to Defendants' Motions for Attorneys' Fees filed byPerfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 1/10/2005)
December 17, 2004 62
Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in support of Motion by MasterCard and Others for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed byMastercard International Incorporated, Humboldt Bank, First Data Corporation, Cardservice International, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2004)
December 3, 2004 52
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 3, 2004. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2004)
November 16, 2004 50
Minute Entry: Hearing On the defnedants' motions to dismiss 1st amended complaint held on 11/15/2004 before JAMES WARE (Date Filed: 11/16/2004). (Court Reporter IRENE RODRIGUEZ.) (rd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2004)
November 1, 2004 49
REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Cardservice International, Inc., First Data Corporation, Humboldt Bank, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa International Service Association. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2004)
October 18, 2004 48
Memorandum in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 10/18/2004)
September 30, 2004 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER re briefing schedule on motion to dismiss; order resetting case management conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on Sept. 30, 2004. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2004)
September 29, 2004 46
Proposed Order and Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Cardservice International, Inc., First Data Corporation, Humboldt Bank, Mastercard International Incorporated, Perfect 10, Inc., Visa International Service Association. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 9/29/2004)
August 6, 2004 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2004)
July 19, 2004 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 36 stipulation to continue July 26, 2004 case management conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/19/2004. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 16, 2004 36
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Case Management Conference Report and to Continue the Case Management Conference by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 7/16/2004)
July 9, 2004 35
Minute Entry: Hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss held on 7/9/2004 before JAMES WARE; Motion submitted after argument of counsel (Date Filed: 7/9/2004). (Court Reporter IRENE RODRIGUEZ.) (rd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2004)
June 4, 2004 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 4, 2004. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2004)
June 3, 2004 33
NOTICE by Perfect 10, Inc. OF ERRATA TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 6/3/2004)
June 1, 2004 32
Table of contents & authorities/Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 6/1/2004) Modified on 7/8/2004 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2004 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing hearing on the defendant's motion to dismiss from 6/11/04 to 6/28/04@9am and continuing 7/19/04 case management conference to 7/26/04@10am. Signed by Judge JAMES WARE on 5/26/04. (rd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2004)
May 20, 2004 30
STIPULATION re 17 Clerks Notice, 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted And Proposed Order by Cardservice International, Inc., First Data Corporation, Humboldt Bank. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/20/2004)
May 17, 2004 29
EXHIBITS 5 to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2004)
May 14, 2004 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER rescheduling motion to dismiss to Friday, June 11 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 14, 2004. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2004)
May 11, 2004 25
Proposed Order re 17 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference by Visa International Service Association. (Jansen, Mark) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
April 20, 2004 24
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mastercard International Incorporated (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 4/20/2004)
April 19, 2004 23
MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Cardservice International, Inc., First Data Corporation, Humboldt Bank. (Related document(s)22) (Page, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2004)
April 9, 2004 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/04. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2004)
April 8, 2004 19
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Page Limits on Motion to Dismiss by Cardservice International, Inc., First Data Corporation, Humboldt Bank. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 4/8/2004)
March 10, 2004 18
AFFIDAVIT re 17 Clerks Notice of Case Management Conference (Proof of Service) by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 3/10/2004)
March 9, 2004 17
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2004 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2004. (rd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2004)
March 5, 2004 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Slaughter , ROBERT A. VAN NETS, MICHAEL H. PAGE (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/5/2004)
March 1, 2004 15
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,,,,, Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants To Respond To Complaint by Visa International Service Association. (Jansen, Mark) (Filed on 3/1/2004)
February 26, 2004 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 2/26/04. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2004)
February 25, 2004 13
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2004)
February 24, 2004 12
AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, and related orders and dispute resolution information served on First Data Corporation on 2/16/2004, filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 2/24/2004)
February 20, 2004 11
AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, coversheet, order setting initial case management conference, District Court rules, ECF registration information, and Dispute Resolution procedures served on Humboldt Bank on 2/18/2004, filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 19, 2004 9
Certification of Damages Reasonably Recoverable Exceeding $150,000 (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 2/19/2004)
February 18, 2004 8
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge served on Howard E. King, Jeffrey N. Mausner, John R. Yates on 2/18/2004, filed by Perfect 10, Inc.. (Rothschild, Stephen) (Filed on 2/18/2004)
February 4, 2004 4
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by FEB. 18, 2004. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2004 (klh, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2004 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Form (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect 10, Inc. v. Visa International Service Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Bank
Represented By: Robert James Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corporation
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardservice International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Represented By: Mark T. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect 10, Inc.
Represented By: John Root Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?