Montano v. Sinnaco

Case Number: 5:2004cv00543
Filed: February 9, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM re 102 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/24/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 16, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY AND MOTION IN LIMINE DEADLINE re 76 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
May 4, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE (approving 65 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/4/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
January 13, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE re 61 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/12/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 16, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE re 59 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/9/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
August 11, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Certificate of Service by Mail re 52 .(cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
March 3, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
December 22, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 16 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/8/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montano v. Sinnaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?