Fox v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv00874
Filed: March 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 469 467 455 POST-JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/30/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (rslc1, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 466 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 455 FURTHER BRIEFING OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Richard Seeborg on 04/19/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 6, 2010 453 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 450 ENLARGING TIME FOR A MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 29, 2010 449 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT RE: 446 FOR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/29/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 24, 2010 444 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 427 CHANGING DATE AND TIME OF MOTION HEARING AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 17, 2010 408 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 407 GRANTING REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/17/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010).
February 11, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/11/2010. rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 4, 2010 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 351 , 350 LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/04/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 21, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 357 GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/21/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010). Modified on 2/4/2010 (rslc1, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2010 345 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER RE: 344 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/07/2010. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 30, 2009 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 312 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 12/30/2009. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 23, 2009 342 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER RE: 340 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 16, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 324 DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 11, 2009 333 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RE: 332 . Motion Hearing re: 312 and Supplemental Case Management Conference continued to 12/17/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
October 29, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 307 CHANGING TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
August 25, 2009 296 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION RE: 295 , RE: (104 in 5:08-cv-01098-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 5, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 289 RE: REMOVAL OF DOCKET NO. 287 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
May 20, 2009 286 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: COORDINATION OF PROPOSED DISCOVERY, RE: 99 in 5:08-cv-01098-RS, 284 in 5:04-cv-00874-RS (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
February 11, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 276 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Causes of Action Under the RICO Statute filed by Richard B. Fox. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
January 28, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2009 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009).
January 16, 2009 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 267 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Staff. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/16/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
November 4, 2008 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/4/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 30, 2008 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion to Dismiss (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Good Samaritan Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?