Schmidt et al v. Levi Strauss & Co. et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv01026
Filed: March 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2008 298 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 297 for Dismissal With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/11/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 30, 2008 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Stipulation to Set Hearing on Shortened Time. Hearing on 282 plaintiffs' motion to compel set for 11/7/2008, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Plaintiffs' moving papers due by 10/29/2008. Defendant's opposition due by 10/31/2008. Reply waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/29/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 20, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Representatives from the Law Offices of Philip E. Kay and the Popelka Law Group with full authority to negotiate and settle case shall attend 11/3/2008 settlement conference at 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/20/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 30, 2008 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Levi Strauss & Co. & Laura Liang's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Defamation Claim filed by Laura Liang, Levi Strauss & Co. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt et al v. Levi Strauss & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?