Advanced Microtherm, Inc. v. Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Advanced Microtherm, Inc., HVAC Sales, Inc. and John Karamanos
Defendant: Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation, Tempco, Inc., Price Industries, Inc. and F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc.,
Special_master: Thomas HR Denver
Movant: Ray L. Hellwig Mechanical Co., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2004cv02266
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 2049 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution (Money Judgment) issued. Signed by The Executive Committee on 07/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Costs)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 15, 2011 2035 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
November 30, 2010 1961 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Amount Plaintiffs may Offset from Amount of Sanctions Awarded to Defendant Norman Wright. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
October 27, 2010 1943 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
September 22, 2010 1869 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 1783 Defendant Norman Wrights Motion for Monetary Sanctions; and ORDER that Plaintiffs May Offset Amount of Reasonable Fees Incurred in Connection with Certain Prior Motions. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 8, 2010 1840 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each member of the jury hearing the above case shall receive a total attendance fee of $50.00 per day for each day of service in excess of ten (10) days. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 3, 2010 1831 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Allowing Defense Counsel to Bring to Court Certain Equipment for Trial re 1827 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 25, 2010 1803 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: LODGING OF FULL EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 25, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 1799 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIALCONFERENCE ORDER - JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 24, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 28, 2010 1773 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CONTEMPT OF COURT HEARING RE: PAYMENTS TO SPECIAL MASTER re 1772 Status Report filed by Thomas HR Denver. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 28, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 15, 2010 1764 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PAYMENTS TO FORMER SPECIAL MASTER; SETTING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT OF COURT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/23/2010 09:00 AM. This hearing will be vacated if all payments are paid on or before 8/6/2010, and the Court receives a Status Report from Mr. Denver to that effect. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
May 19, 2010 1562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 1295 Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation's Motion Shift Costs. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 17, 2010 1558 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1295 MOTION for an Order to shift costs filed by Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/17/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 30, 2010 1479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1214 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel F. W. Spencer & Son, Inc. to Produce the Documents Demanded in Plaintiffs Request for Production, Set 2. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 26, 2010 1473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 1381 Motion for Protective Order. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 21, 2010 1469 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER INTERIM ORDER re 1209 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Obedience with Prior Court Order Requiring F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc. to Produce Specified Electronic Accounting Documents and E-Mails in Reasonable Usable Form. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/21/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 15, 2010 1416 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1409 Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs' and FW Spencer & Son, Inc.'s Meet and Confer re Electronic Discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/15/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 9, 2010 1408 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1406 1404 Dispute over Duration and Procedure for Meet and Confer Previously Ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/9/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 6, 2010 1402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule re Dispute over Duration and Procedure for Meet and Confer Previously Ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/6/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 29, 2010 1393 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Two Motions and VACATING Hearing on Remaining Motions That Were on Calendar for March 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 1387 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 1208 re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Obedience with Prior Court Order Requiring F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc. to Produce Specified Electronic Accounting Documents and E-Mails in Reasonable Usable Form and Request for Evidentiary and Monetary Sanctions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/26/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 8, 2010 1313 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1311 Extension of Time for Defendant F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc. to File Oppositions to Plaintiff Advanced Microtherm, Inc.s Motions to Compel Obedience with Prior Court Order, Requests for Admission to Be Deemed Admitted, and Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/8/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 26, 2010 1302 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 1219 Continuing Hearing on Defendant F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiff Advanced Microtherm, Inc. to Compel Plaintiff Advanced Microtherm to Provide Further Responses to Special Interrogatories 1-16; and Denying Request for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/26/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 27, 2010 1259 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1258 Resetting Hearing on Defendants, Norman Wright Mechanical's and F.W. Spencer & Son's, Motions to Compel and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 21, 2010 1257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Application of this Courts Prior Order re Speaking Objections to Non-Party Deponents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/21/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 15, 2010 1256 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Hearing Date for Dispositive Motions from 4/12/2010 top 5/24/2010 re 1253 Stipulation. Last Date for hearing Dispositive Motions by 5/24/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 8, 2010 1240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1207 Correcting Error in Order of December 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/7/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
December 18, 2009 1207 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER re 1088 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Document Requests and Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/18/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 11, 2009 1206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 1164 Norman Wright's Motion for Protective Order; and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Norman Wright Should Not Be Required to Reimburse Plaintiffs for the Attorneys Fees Incurred to Draft the Motion to Compel and the Opposition to this Motion (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 10, 2009 1205 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1202 to Withdraw Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/8/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 19, 2009 1140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing and Scheduling Supplemental Joint Briefing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/19/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 14, 2009 1130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 874 837 Motions to Seal. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 9, 2009 1129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 1045 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation to Produce Documents (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 7, 2009 1127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Omnibus Hearing for All Discovery Sanctions Motions. Hearing set for 10:00 a.m. on 1/26/2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/6/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 11, 2009 1085 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER re the Deposition of William Spencer. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/11/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 9, 2009 1074 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Briefing and Hearing Regarding Plaintiffs Notification to the Court That They Believe the Documents Defendant F.W. Spencer Is Producing Are Not Kept in a Reasonably Business-like Manner, and Request That F.W. Spencer Be Ordered to Organize and Label the Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/9/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
August 19, 2009 1041 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER INTERIM ORDER re 1004 Plaintiffs Motion for Order Requiring William Spencer and F.W. Spencer to Appear for Deposition and 995 Defendant F.W. Spencers Motion for Protective Order; and ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/19/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 11, 2009 1035 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER re 1034 Richard Yates Deposition. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/11/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 5, 2009 1033 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER re 1027 Expert Designations and Counter Designations. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 16, 2009 1013 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware adopting Report and Recommendations 935 ; denying 938 Motion to Confirm Parameters of Separate Rule 42(b) Trial; Modifying Scheduling Order; Setting Case Management Conference (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 18, 2009 989 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(b). Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 10, 2009 987 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Removal of Innotec, Inc and Attorney Peter Michael Hart and Stuart E. Jones re 946 Letter. Defendant Innotec, Inc. terminated., Attorneys Peter Michael Hart and Stuart E. Jones terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 27, 2009 975 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE HEARING FROM 6/1/2009 TO 6/15/2009 re 974 Notice (Other). Set/Reset Deadlines as to 974 Notice (Other), 938 MOTION to confirm Parameters of Separate Rule 42(b) Trial, 935 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 943 Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendations. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 18, 2009 968 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING SCOPE OF JUNE 1, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 7, 2009 936 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY PLAN ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/7/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 6, 2009 933 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY ISSUES RAISED IN PARTIES' DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/6/09. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 20, 2009 923 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Rule 26(e) Supplementation; and re 585 Finding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Continuing Discovery Responses under Rule 26 Moot, and Vacating Hearing Thereon. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/20/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 12, 2009 915 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDERS re 905 Objection, filed by Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation, 903 Objection, filed by Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation, 902 Objection, filed by Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 12, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 13, 2009 898 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Briefing on Reasonableness of Special Master Denvers Fees. That, no later than ten court days after the Special Master Files the breakdown of his fees. any party may file a brief, The Special Master may respond to any briefs within four weeks after they are filed. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/13/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified text on 3/12/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 887 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 831 Scheduling Further Status and Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/6/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 29, 2009 884 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 867 Order Remanding to Magistrate Judge for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/28/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 27, 2009 882 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 844 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Continuing Discovery Responses Under FRCP Rule 26. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/27/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 16, 2009 867 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 861 Objection, filed by F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc.,, 859 Objection, filed by Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 16, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 13, 2009 860 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 852 & 859 Vacating Order to Defendants to Comply with Prior Order; and ORDER Modifying Briefing on Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Motion. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/13/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
December 22, 2008 833 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Briefing and Hearing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/19/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
October 10, 2008 784 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 674 & 749 Granting Plaintiffs Request to Seal Response to Special Master's Declaration and Tentatively Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Submit the Response to the Court In Camera; and REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Special Masters Report #39. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/10/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 2, 2008 782 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court tasks the Special Master with the following, please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Microtherm, Inc. v. Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Microtherm, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HVAC Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Karamanos
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Wright Mechanical Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempco, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.W. Spencer & Son, Inc.,
Represented By: Cassiana Aaronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Thomas HR Denver
Represented By: Thomas H R Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Ray L. Hellwig Mechanical Co., Inc.
Represented By: David Irwin Kornbluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?