Richardson v. Curry

Plaintiff: Willie Richardson, III
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 5:2004cv02712
Filed: July 8, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/11/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
July 3, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Motion to Dismiss. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
April 8, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Lift Stay; Dismissing Unexhausted Claims; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Case is Reopened. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
October 23, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Request to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Richardson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Represented By: Laurence Keith Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?