Granite Rock Company v. Teamsters Local 287 International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Fright, construction, General Drivers, Warehousemen & Helpers

Case Number: 5:2004cv02767
Filed: July 9, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: Defendant International's anticipated Motion to Dismiss set for 12/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/7/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
July 14, 2011 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
April 8, 2009 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Compliance with the Remand Order and Mandate of the Ninth Circuit Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari re 400 Joint Case Management Statement. Any party may move to lift the stay by filing the appropriate motion pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 13, 2009 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 391 Objection filed by Granite Rock Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 13, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 5, 2009 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING COMPLIANCE WITH THE REMAND ORDER AND MANDATE OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT PENDING PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI re 395 Joint Case Management Statement. Joint Status Statement due 4/3/2009. Status Conference set for 4/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 3, 2009 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 388 393 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 2/27/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Rock Company v. Teamsters Local 287 International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Fright, construction, General Drivers, Warehousemen & Helpers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?