Palmer et al v. Stassinos

Plaintiff: Susanne Palmer and Sharon Hammer
Defendant: Paul R Stassinos
Case Number: 5:2004cv03026
Filed: July 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2010 265 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 263 for Entry of Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 16, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 259 Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Motions terminated: 256 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Sharon Hammer, Susanne Palmer. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
June 23, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 247 to Extend Time to File Motion for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs: Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
January 9, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying (202) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying (204) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying (206) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 5:04-cv-03026-RMW; denying (164) Motion to Certify Class; denying (180) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying (182) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying (184) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying (231) Motion to Strike in case 5:05-cv-02280-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. Stassinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Palmer
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hammer
Represented By: Paul Arons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R Stassinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?