Aspect Communications Corporation v. Avaya Brasil et al

Plaintiff: Aspect Communications Corporation
Defendant: Avaya Brasil. LTDA and Lucent Technologies Brasil, LTDA
Case Number: 5:2004cv03172
Filed: August 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to FRCP 41(a) re 48 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
February 20, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 Status Report filed by Aspect Communications Corporation, 46 Status Report filed by Avaya Brasil. LTDA. The Court sets 4/13/09 as a date where the parties SHALL file a further Status Report updating the Court on the status of the arbitration. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 20, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 43 Status Report filed by Avaya Brasil. Status Report updating the Court on their arbitration efforts by 2/2/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 4/29/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspect Communications Corporation v. Avaya Brasil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspect Communications Corporation
Represented By: GeeYoung Carolyn Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Brasil. LTDA
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucent Technologies Brasil, LTDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?