Fallon et al v. Locke,Liddell & Sapp,LLP

Plaintiff: Thomas Fallon, Robert Puette, Carl Redfield, Rick Timmins and Alexandre Balkanski
Defendant: Locke,Liddell & Sapp,LLP
Miscellaneous: Ernst & Young LLP
Case Number: 5:2004cv03210
Filed: August 6, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 158 of Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
January 23, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 122 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 131 Extending Deadline for Expert Depositions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
October 28, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 125 Continuing Trial Date, Pretrial and Expert Discovery Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 5/18/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
September 23, 2008 123 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 121 Extending Time for Disclosure of Experts and Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 1, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 111 Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallon et al v. Locke,Liddell & Sapp,LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fallon
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Puette
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Redfield
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Timmins
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandre Balkanski
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locke,Liddell & Sapp,LLP
Represented By: James Anthony Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By: Ashley Marie Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?