Hunt v. Lamarque

Case Number: 5:2004cv03925
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of respondent. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/4/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 27, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/27/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
June 2, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Amend (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
January 29, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting further briefing. Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/29/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Lamarque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?