Google Inc. v. Compression Labs Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. filed a complaint seeking a declaratory judgment that U.S. Patent No. 4,698,672 entitled \"Coding system for reducing redundancy\" owned by defendants Compression Labs, Inc., Forgent Networks, Inc. and General Instruments Corporation is invalid. Defendants have alleged that their patent covers the international standard adopted by the Joint Photographic Experts Group (JPEG) for compression, decompression, transmission and storage of digital still images.

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Forgent Networks Inc, General Instruments Corporation and Compression Labs Inc
Case Number: 5:2004cv03934
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2007 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/4/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 1, 2007 21
Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/1/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/1/2007). The Court dismisses this case and all related cases. The Court shall issue 90-day dismissal orders. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2007)
August 28, 2006 20
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2006 at 10:00 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 12, 2005 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/12/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2005)
August 10, 2005 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2005. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2005 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/9/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2005)
November 30, 2004 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER STAYING case pending JPML decision. 12/8/04 hearing VACATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/30/04. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2004)
November 25, 2004 15
Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed byCompression Labs Inc, Forgent Networks Inc, General Instruments Corporation. (Wessels, Shelley) (Filed on 11/25/2004)
November 9, 2004 12
ORDR SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: the case having been reassigned to the Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton; a Case Management Conference will be held on 1/20/05 at 2:30 P.M. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed by 1/13/05. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/9/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2004)
October 26, 2004 11
NOTICE by Compression Labs Inc, Forgent Networks Inc, General Instruments Corporation Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer 8 (Wessels, Shelley) (Filed on 10/26/2004) Modified on 10/27/2004 (far, Court Staff).
October 25, 2004 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE: C-04-3124 PJH and C-04-3934 CW are related as defined by Civil L.R.3-12(b). Case C-04-3934 is reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2004)
October 20, 2004 9
NOTICE of Related Case ; Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceeding (Wessels, Shelley) (Filed on 10/20/2004)
September 29, 2004 5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 Complaint,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/29/2004)
September 28, 2004 4
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 Complaint,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/28/2004)
September 27, 2004 3
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 Complaint,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order Proof of Service Summons and Complaint (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 9/27/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Compression Labs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forgent Networks Inc
Represented By: Shelley Kelly Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Instruments Corporation
Represented By: Shelley Kelly Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compression Labs Inc
Represented By: Shelley Kelly Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?