Padgett et al v. City of Monte Sereno et al
Case Number: 5:2004cv03946
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 ORDER GRANTING 1244 DEFENDANT WRIGHT'S MOTION TO VACATE OR MODIFY BUSTAMANTE'S PROPOSED RENEWED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:20-cv-00802 NC and 5:04-cv-03946 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/5/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 Order denying 1210 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 12, 2019.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 Order Denying 1206 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 24, 2019.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 ORDER Granting Award of Fees and Costs to Law Firms Kallis & Associates P.C. and Bustamante & Gagliasso P.C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 7, 2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 1150 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER granting 1109 motion related to the lien and STRIKING 1058 notice of lien; denying 1113 motion for relief from previous order regarding attorneys' fees and costs; and denying 1114 motion for indicative ruling. The hearing scheduled for 10/29/2015 is VACATED. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER denying 1096 Motion to Compel Mr. Padgett to file a bond for attorneys' fees and costs under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/13/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER denying 1088 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ORDER DISSOLVING STAY. The parties shall file reply briefs to the pending post-judgment motions (Docket Item Nos. 1041 , 1044 , 1050 ) on or before September 8, 2014. Consistent with the original Briefing Order (Docket Item No. 1040 ), the motions will be deemed submitted for decision upon conclusion of the briefing unless the court orders otherwise. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/25/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 BRIEFING ORDER. On October 11, 2013, the parties appeared before Judge Edward J. Davila for a case management conference. Based on the parties' Case Management Statements and the discussions held at the conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that briefing on the remanded issues of attorneys fees and costsshall be as follows: Motions due by 12/13/2013. Oppositions due by 1/17/2014. Replies due by 2/7/2014. The motions will be deemed submitted for decision uponconclusion of the briefing ordered herein unless the court orders otherwise. Please see Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 996 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RICE. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 9, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 865 Ex Parte Application ; terminating 880 Ex Parte Application (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER re 767 Objection filed by Brian Loventhal, A. Curtis Wright, 770 Objection filed by Brian Loventhal, A. Curtis Wright. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 1, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS RECOMMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 41, REMANDING TO SPECIAL MASTER FOR RECONSIDERATION; OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 42 re 618 Objection filed by Joseph Padgett, Darla Padgett, 591 Objection filed by Joseph Padgett, Darla Padgett. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 20, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified docket text on 3/16/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER OVERRULING 580 Objection, filed by Joseph Padgett, Darla Padgett. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 6, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER overruling 570 Objection, filed by Joseph Padgett, Darla Padgett. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 9, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 559 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER re 548 Objection, filed by Brian Loventhal, A. Curtis Wright. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 2, 2008. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett et al v. City of Monte Sereno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?