Carranza et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv04161
Filed: September 30, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 73 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/14/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
April 27, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (47 in 5:10-cv-05924-EJD), (66 in 5:04-cv-04161-EJD), (43 in 5:10-cv-05928-EJD) STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES. 1. All trial and pre-trial deadlines in the above actions are vacated; 2. The Parties shall file a j oint status report within 60 days informing the Court as to the status of the resolution of these cases, or in the alternative file a joint motion to dismiss within 60 days. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
March 22, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 60 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR TRIAL : Deadline to f ile Consolidation and Bifircation Motions due by 6/8/2012. Motion Hearing re Consolidation and Bifircation Motions set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Intierm Joint Case Management Statement du e by 6/29/2012. Interim Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. The following dates set in the July 11 Order will remain as ordered: 8/10/12: Expert Discovery Cut-off, 8/31/12: Dispos itive and Daubert Motions Filing deadline. 9/21/12: Hearing on Anticipated Dispositive & Daubert Motions at 9:00 AM, 10/19/12: Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, 10/26/12: Final Pretrial Conference, 11/5/12: Trial. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
July 6, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JUNE 22, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (32 in 5:10-cv-05928-EJD) Proposed Order, (48 in 5:04-cv-04161-EJD) Proposed Order, (32 in 5:10-cv-05924-EJD) Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Further Case Management Conference as to ALL cases set for 6/20/2011 10:00 AM. The parties may commence discovery, pursuant to the parties' agreements. All discovery disputes are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for adjudication. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 21, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES FOR FILING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (8 in 5:10-cv-05924-JW) Stipulation, (7 in 5:10-cv-05928-JW) Stipulation, (21 in 5:04-cv-04161-JW) Stipulation. The parties' Stipul ation to continue the Conference for these related cases for nearly sixty days is DENIED because the parties have not articulated good cause sufficient to justify such an an extended continuance. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
January 19, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 1507. Also attached are certified copies of the MDL Pretrial Order, Master Docket Sheet (4:03-cv-1507-BRW) and the individual docket sheet for the case being remanded. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Docket Sheet, # 3 Docket Sheet from the Eastern District of Arkansas (their number 05-0015)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza et al v. Wyeth, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?