Gorman v. Wolpoff & Abramson, LLP et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv04507
Filed: October 25, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) re 151 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. ***4/4/2011 Hearing/Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 20, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 14, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 145 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court does not find good cause to continue the January 24 Conference. On December 10, 2010, the parties filed a Stipulation seeking continuance of the December 20 Conference which the C ourt granted. This is the parties' second request for a continuance based on settlement discussions. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation to Continue. On or before January 14, 2011, the parties shall file a Joint Statement updating the Court on settlement efforts. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 21, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Substitute Party re 143 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the parties' representation, the Court finds good cause to continue the Conference. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the Case Management Conference to January 24, 2011 at 10 a.m. On or befor e January 14, 2011, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement updating the Court on the status of the settlement negotiations or provide the Court with a proposed schedule as to how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
March 4, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 126 Case Management Statement filed by MBNA American Bank, N.A. In light of the parties' representation, the Court VACATES the Case Management Conference currently set for March 9, 2009. The Court will set another conference date once the mandate is issued. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 124 USCA Order. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 2/27/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. Wolpoff & Abramson, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?