Smith et al v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv04793
Filed: November 10, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/6/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
March 6, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Supplemental Opposition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
July 29, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 114 Motion for Appointment of Expert. (jg COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
June 3, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Declaration of Lt. R. Luna and Attached Exhibits A-F. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
January 27, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or notice Regarding Such Motions; Instructions to Clerk. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
March 18, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?