In re: IMPAX LABORATORIES INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2004cv04802
Filed: November 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Costs to Representative Plaintiff re 235 Notice (Other). Signed by Judge James Ware on June 11, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified docket text on 7/23/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 12, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
November 25, 2008 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Docket # 211 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: IMPAX LABORATORIES INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?